Global Patent Index - EP 0968349 A1

EP 0968349 A1 2000-01-05 - A VENT

Title (en)

A VENT

Title (de)

EIN ENTLÜFTUNGSFENSTER

Title (fr)

EVENT

Publication

EP 0968349 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98909651 A

Priority

  • GB 9800787 W
  • GB 9705721 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2323407A] A vent (10) comprising a fixed frame (3) and an opening member (5) attached to the fixed frame (3) by hinges (7,12), the opening member (5) being movable between a position closing the vent (10) and an open position by drive means (9), wherein three hinges (7,12) support three sides of the opening member (5) and a fourth side is driven by the drive means (9). As a result, smoother opening of such a vent occurs without the need for a second drive means.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/34; E05D 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/34 (2006.01); E05F 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/34 (2013.01); E05F 15/611 (2013.01); E05D 15/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/604 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/694 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842941A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

GB 2323407 A 19980923; GB 9705721 D0 19970507; AT 245246 T 20030815; AU 6413298 A 19981020; DE 69816428 D1 20030821; DE 69816428 T2 20040513; DE 69816428 T3 20070419; EP 0968349 A1 20000105; EP 0968349 B1 20030716; EP 0968349 B2 20061213; HK 1024282 A1 20031031; WO 9842941 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180317

2018-05-02 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180316

2018-04-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180316

2018-03-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-03-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69816428

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170309

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ASSA ABLOY LIMITED, GB

- Effective date: 20160224

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ASSA ABLOY LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SECURISTYLE GROUP HOLDINGS LIMITED, GB

2015-09-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SECURISTYLE GROUP HOLDINGS LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SECURISTYLE LIMITED, GB

2015-03-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ASSA ABLOY LIMITED, WILLENHALL, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SECURISTYLE LTD., CHELTENHAM, GLOUCESTERSHIRE, GB

- Document: DE 69816428

- Effective date: 20150204

2015-03-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69816428

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20150204

2015-02-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69816428

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

2014-07-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140619 AND 20140625

2007-05-25 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040318

2007-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-12-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT

2004-06-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHUECO INTERNATIONAL KG

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2003-10-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-10-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69816428 P 20030821

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010926

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990906

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT