Global patent index - EP 0968357 A1

EP 0968357 A1 2000-01-05 - ACTUATOR OPERATING DEVICE FOR ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE ACTUATION IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

ACTUATOR OPERATING DEVICE FOR ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE ACTUATION IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETRIEB VON AKTOREN ZUR ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN VENTILSTEUERUNG BEI BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER DES ACTIONNEURS SERVANT A LA COMMANDE DE SOUPAPES DANS DES MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0968357 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965229 A

Priority

  • DE 19756095 A
  • EP 9807879 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756095A1] The invention relates to an actuator operating device for electromagnetic valve actuation in internal combustion engines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); H01F 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931359A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756095 A1 19990624; DE 19756095 C2 20011122; EP 0968357 A1 20000105; EP 0968357 B1 20030625; JP 2001514721 A 20010911; US 6164253 A 20001226; WO 9931359 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051203

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041203

2004-12-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041203

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-12-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-11-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEMIC TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

2000-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEMIC TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990520

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT