Global Patent Index - EP 0968359 A1

EP 0968359 A1 2000-01-05 - LOAD ADJUSTMENT DEVICE

Title (en)

LOAD ADJUSTMENT DEVICE

Title (de)

LASTVERSTELLVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE DE CHARGE

Publication

EP 0968359 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98906934 A

Priority

  • DE 19711408 A
  • EP 9800675 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711408A1] The invention relates to a load adjustment device for an internal combustion engine, comprising a torsion spring (4) which is fixed with a positive fit to a setting shaft (3) for a gas regulator and a supporting part (2). The torsion spring (4) is bent into a U-shape at one end to encompass a pin (17) of the supporting part (2) and has a flexible tongue (16) pointing in the direction of the bottom of said U-shape. For assembly, the open end of the U of the torsion spring (4) is forced over the pin (17) until the flexible tongue (16) snaps in behind the pin (17). The torsion spring (4) is then connected to the pin (17) so that it has a positive fit, and can transfer pressure in both directions of rotation to the setting shaft (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0269 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0277 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841745A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711408 A1 19981001; EP 0968359 A1 20000105; EP 0968359 B1 20021002; JP 2001516415 A 20010925; US 6279533 B1 20010828; WO 9841745 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-02-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060207

2005-02-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805803 20021107

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010528

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990909

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB