Global Patent Index - EP 0968367 A1

EP 0968367 A1 2000-01-05 - FUEL-INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

FUEL-INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZSYSTEM FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0968367 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98919115 A

Priority

  • DE 19712135 A
  • EP 9801596 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19712135C1] The fuel injection system includes several fuel injectors (5) supplied from a high pressure pump (6) via a common supply line (1) and high pressure lines (2,4) to the individual injectors. There are high pressure stores (3) in the high pressure lines. The fuel storage capacity of each of these stores is 80-300, preferably 120-200, times the maximum injection amount for each injection process. The diameter of the high pressure lines from the common supply line to the stores is such that the variation in amount at the fuel injectors is minimal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 55/04 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/02 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 55/04 (2013.01); F02M 2200/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842978A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19712135 C1 19980813; AT 209300 T 20011215; EP 0968367 A1 20000105; EP 0968367 B1 20011121; JP 2001518164 A 20011009; US 6220224 B1 20010424; WO 9842978 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160319

2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160319

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160319

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160319

2016-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 209300 T

- Effective date: 20160319

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802336

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020219

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802336 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209300 T 20011215

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990828

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI