Global Patent Index - EP 0968368 A1

EP 0968368 A1 2000-01-05 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT OF A FINAL IGNITION STAGE

Title (en)

CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT OF A FINAL IGNITION STAGE

Title (de)

SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG EINER ZÜNDENDSTUFE

Title (fr)

MONTAGE DE CIRCUIT POUR ETAGE FINAL D'ALLUMAGE

Publication

EP 0968368 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912264 A

Priority

  • DE 9800474 W
  • DE 19711204 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711204A1] The invention relates to a circuit arrangement for a final ignition stage, specially for the ignition circuit of a motor vehicle, provided with a switching means controlling a primary winding of an ignition coil and with a control switch for said switching means. According to the invention, the control circuit (10) enables two-step activation of the ignition coil (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 3/04; F02P 3/045

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/04 (2006.01); F02P 3/045 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/0453 (2013.01); F02P 3/0435 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841756A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711204 A1 19980924; DE 19711204 C2 19990114; BR 9808338 A 20000516; EP 0968368 A1 20000105; EP 0968368 B1 20050810; JP 2001514720 A 20010911; JP 4124276 B2 20080723; KR 20000076322 A 20001226; US 6107748 A 20000822; WO 9841756 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812996

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812996

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110218

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110218

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110218

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060511

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812996 P 20050915

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040521

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991018

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT