Global patent index - EP 0968371 A1

EP 0968371 A1 2000-01-05 - FLUID COOLING DEVICE

Title (en)

FLUID COOLING DEVICE

Title (de)

FLUIDKÜHLVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE FLUIDE

Publication

EP 0968371 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912445 A

Priority

  • DE 19711591 A
  • EP 9801263 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711591A1] The invention relates to a fluid cooling device in the form of a modular unit having a motor (10) which drives a ventilator wheel (2) and a hydraulic pump (14) which takes fluid from an oil reservoir (16) and delivers it to a hydraulic work circuit (18) which heats the fluid and sends it to a heat exchanger (20), from whic h the fluid returns, cooled, to the oil reservoir (16). The coil reservoir (16), being shaped like a trough and surrounding at least part of the motor (10) and the hydraulic pump (14), and having high walls (24) in the manner of a half-shell, results in a relatively high-volume oil reservoir which is nonetheless a part o f the fluid cooling device with a compact, space-saving structure, due to the fact that it at least partially contains parts of said fluid cooling device, thus saving space.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 1/26; F04B 23/02; F04B 53/08; F15B 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 23/02 (2006.01); F04B 53/08 (2006.01); F15B 1/00 (2006.01); F15B 1/26 (2006.01); F15B 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 21/042 (2013.01); F04B 23/025 (2013.01); F04B 53/08 (2013.01); F15B 1/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842986A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711591 A1 19980924; AT 228213 T 20021215; CN 1097683 C 20030101; CN 1250508 A 20000412; DK 0968371 T3 20030317; EP 0968371 A1 20000105; EP 0968371 B1 20021120; ES 2187948 T3 20030616; FI 109485 B 20020815; FI 991945 A 19990913; JP 2001518172 A 20011009; PT 968371 E 20030228; US 6290473 B1 20010918; WO 9842986 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150310

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040306

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070306

2007-11-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-03-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060321

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-03-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 09

2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040308

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-10-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HYDAC FLUIDTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040308

2004-03-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040307

2004-03-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040306

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2187948

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030320

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-03-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-03-05 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-03-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-02-13 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-02-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030131

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59806358

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030102

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 228213

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20021215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDAC FLUIDTECHNIK GMBH

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990709

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE