Global patent index - EP 0968372 A1

EP 0968372 A1 2000-01-05 - PLATE-TYPE MOUNTING BASE

Title (en)

PLATE-TYPE MOUNTING BASE

Title (de)

PLATTENARTIGE MONTAGEBASIS

Title (fr)

BASE DE MONTAGE EN FORME DE PLAQUE

Publication

EP 0968372 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98914858 A

Priority

  • DE 19711227 A
  • EP 9801170 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711227A1] The invention relates to a plate-type mounting base (2) for detachably mounting a valve unit (3). Said valve unit (3) comprises several valve modules (4). Said mounting base (2) has a modular construction and contains a plurality of individual base segments (23) which are joined to form a rigid unit. Several connecting segments (25) which correspond to said valve modules (4) are located beneath said base segments (23). Said connecting segments contain consumption channels (33) which communicate with said valve modules (4), an electrical and/or fluidic functional unit (38) being allocated at least partly to said consumption channels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 27/00 (2006.01); F15B 11/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0839 (2013.01); F15B 13/0817 (2013.01); F15B 13/0821 (2013.01); F15B 13/085 (2013.01); F15B 13/0857 (2013.01); F15B 13/0889 (2013.01); F15B 13/0892 (2013.01); Y10T 137/5109 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87885 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841766A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711227 A1 19980924; DE 19711227 C2 20001130; EP 0968372 A1 20000105; EP 0968372 B1 20031105; JP 2000513079 A 20001003; JP 3162083 B2 20010425; US 6179006 B1 20010130; WO 9841766 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130303

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59810086

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130303

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130304

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-10-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120216

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59810086

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20031211

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: VALVE ARRANGEMENT

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020926

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990804

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE