Global Patent Index - EP 0968384 A2

EP 0968384 A2 2000-01-05 - VALVE LOCK AND ADAPTER

Title (en)

VALVE LOCK AND ADAPTER

Title (de)

VENTILVERRIEGELUNG UND ADAPTER

Title (fr)

CLAVETTE ET RACCORD DE SOUPAPE

Publication

EP 0968384 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98912615 A

Priority

  • GB 9800877 W
  • GB 9706015 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842937A2] A valve lock for locking a valve spindle in a selected position corresponding to the valve being for example fully open or fully closed. The lock has a housing which is mounted on the valve body and a hub which engages and rotates with the valve spindle relative to the housing. A latch is provided between the housing and the hub, the latch being actuatable by a key to assume a latched condition in which rotation of the hub relative to the housing is permitted in one direction but prevented in the other direction. A spindle position indicator is coupled by a transmission to the hub so as to be displaced as a result of rotation of the spindle, thereby to indicate the spindle position relative to the valve body. The spindle position indicator prevents actuation of the latch by the key except when the spindle is in the selected position as represented by the spindle position indicator. The spindle position indicator is locked in the predetermined orientation corresponding to the selected spindle position when the latch has been actuated by the key. The transmission incorporates a slip clutch which enables rotation of the hub in one direction if the spindle position indicator is locked in the predetermined orientation and sufficient torque is applied to the spindle engaging member to cause the clutch to slip. As a result the selected position can be reset simply by locking the spindle position indicator and then rotating the hub to a reset position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16K 35/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/60 (2006.01); F16K 35/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16K 35/06 (2013.01); F16K 31/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842937A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842937 A2 19981001; WO 9842937 A3 19981223; AU 6739598 A 19981020; EP 0968384 A2 20000105; GB 9706015 D0 19970507

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030408

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WADSWORTH, MARTIN, JAMES

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FOSTER, STEPHEN, LESLIE

2002-09-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: VALVE LOCK

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010827

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991020

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT