Global Patent Index - EP 0968395 A2

EP 0968395 A2 2000-01-05 - REFRIGERATED CATERING SERVICE TROLLEY AND INSTALLATION FOR RELOADING REFRIGERATING AGENT

Title (en)

REFRIGERATED CATERING SERVICE TROLLEY AND INSTALLATION FOR RELOADING REFRIGERATING AGENT

Title (de)

GEKÜHLTER KARREN UND KÜHLMITTELNACHFÜLLANLAGE

Title (fr)

CHARIOT REFRIGERE ET INSTALLATION DE RECHARGEMENT EN AGENT REFRIGERANT

Publication

EP 0968395 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 98913852 A

Priority

  • FR 9800452 W
  • FR 9702871 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2760826A1] Catering service trolleys for preserving and distributing meal service trays in aeroplanes. Said trolley comprises side walls (28, 30) with double shells defining vertical channels (34) opening at their upper part into the housing (22) containing the refrigerating agent and at their lower part in the proximity of the bottom of the section (26) receiving the meal-trays, thus enabling the refrigerating gas to circulate by convection over the whole height of the trolley and a more homogeneous temperature distribution.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 3/12; C01B 31/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/125 (2013.01); A47B 2031/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840680A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2760826 A1 19980918; FR 2760826 B1 19990423; AU 6839998 A 19980929; CA 2284873 A1 19980917; DE 69808894 D1 20021128; DE 69808894 T2 20030618; EP 0968395 A2 20000105; EP 0968395 B1 20021023; US 6295829 B1 20011002; WO 9840680 A2 19980917; WO 9840680 A3 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100306

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090320

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. L'*AIR LIQUIDE A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-01-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-01-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-01-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808894 20021128

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES IT LI NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: REFRIGERATED TROLLEY

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991011

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES IT LI NL PT SE