Global Patent Index - EP 0968461 A1

EP 0968461 A1 2000-01-05 - PRESSURE REGULATING SYSTEM

Title (en)

PRESSURE REGULATING SYSTEM

Title (de)

DRUCKREGELVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REGULATION DE PRESSION

Publication

EP 0968461 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98910829 A

Priority

  • GB 9800653 W
  • GB 9705995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2323683A] A system for regulating the gas pressure in a gas supply includes an underground pressure regulating module cartridge 112 for insertion into an underground chamber. This receives a high pressure gas stream and produces a low pressure output at a regulated pressure. The cartridge includes a main regulator valve 118 with associated pilot valves 120, 168, and a slam shut valve. Data relating to gas utilisation and pressure variation is obtained over a predetermined period of time (figure 3) by a logging device. From this information, a plurality of setting parameters are determined which replicate the utilisation requirements over a given time period; for instance, the variations in demand at different times throughout the day and night. Control means 153 then controls the pilot valve 168, and thus the main regulator valve 118, in accordance with the gas requirements determined for the current time period. The pilot valve 168 can include a double diaphragm. The predetermined utilisation data and control data can be received by the control means from a remote site via a modem.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 16/20; F17D 3/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17D 1/04 (2006.01); F17D 3/01 (2006.01); G05D 16/16 (2006.01); G05D 16/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05D 16/2026 (2013.01); F17D 1/04 (2013.01); F17D 3/01 (2013.01); G05D 16/163 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843140A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2323683 A 19980930; GB 2323683 B 20000913; GB 9803942 D0 19980422; AR 012131 A1 20000927; AR 019020 A2 20011226; BR 9808414 A 20000523; EP 0968461 A1 20000105; GB 9705995 D0 19970507; HK 1016287 A1 20010720; HU 0001854 A2 20000928; HU 0001854 A3 20010628; RU 2178579 C2 20020120; SK 129699 A3 20000516; WO 9843140 A1 19981001; WO 9843140 A9 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-10-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LATTICE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LIMITED

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010409

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991022

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE