Global Patent Index - EP 0968487 A2

EP 0968487 A2 2000-01-05 - PRINTER WITH JOURNAL STORAGE

Title (en)

PRINTER WITH JOURNAL STORAGE

Title (de)

DRUCKER MIT JOURNALSPEICHER

Title (fr)

IMPRIMANTE COMPORTANT UNE MEMOIRE DE JOURNAL

Publication

EP 0968487 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98906821 A

Priority

  • DE 9800147 W
  • DE 19706543 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9837527A2] The invention relates to a method and a device which replaces a printer having two recording media, one of them a journal, by buffering the data for the journal in a non-volatile memory and releasing it on command by means of the only printing element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07G 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/48 (2006.01); G07G 1/12 (2006.01); G07G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07G 5/00 (2013.01); B41J 11/48 (2013.01); G07G 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9837527A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9837527 A2 19980827; WO 9837527 A3 19981119; AT 224572 T 20021015; EP 0968487 A2 20000105; EP 0968487 B1 20020918; ES 2184238 T3 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-12-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2184238

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020918

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030116

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805611

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-24

2002-10-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 224572

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-09-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PRINTER WITH JOURNAL STORAGE AND TWO INTERFACES

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF GMBH & CO KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990805

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE