Global Patent Index - EP 0968499 A1

EP 0968499 A1 2000-01-05 - A MOBILE OR PORTABLE PLAYBACK APPARATUS

Title (en)

A MOBILE OR PORTABLE PLAYBACK APPARATUS

Title (de)

MOBILES ODER PORTABLES ABSPIELGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE REPRODUCTION SONORE MOBILE OU PORTABLE

Publication

EP 0968499 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98902156 A

Priority

  • CH 49197 A
  • CH 83897 A
  • IB 9800229 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9838643A1] A mobile or portable playback apparatus, in particular with a MiniDisc or CD player or with a cassette apparatus, is characterised by a radio telephone circuit integrated into the playback apparatus and a speaker microphone for carrying out a telephone conversation. In a headphone cable (9) which creates a connection to headphones or earphones there is provided a dial (16) with at least one operating key (17.1 to 17.3) for the radio telephone circuit. The speaker microphone may then be accommodated in the dial (16) or pivotably carried by the headphones.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 31/00; H04M 1/60; H04M 1/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 33/06 (2006.01); G11B 31/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01); H04M 1/03 (2006.01); H04M 1/60 (2006.01); H04M 1/725 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/6058 (2013.01); G11B 31/00 (2013.01); H04M 1/6066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9838643A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9838643 A1 19980903; EP 0968499 A1 20000105; JP 2001510615 A 20010731; TW 408840 U 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-06 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1024331

2002-01-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20010804

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-02-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASCOM AG

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990607

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI SE