Global Patent Index - EP 0968512 A1

EP 0968512 A1 2000-01-05 - BI-SUBSTRATE PLASMA PANEL

Title (en)

BI-SUBSTRATE PLASMA PANEL

Title (de)

PLASMA ANZEIGETAFEL MIT ZWEI SUBSTRATE

Title (fr)

PANNEAU A PLASMA BI-SUBSTRAT

Publication

EP 0968512 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99900920 A

Priority

  • FR 9900056 W
  • FR 9800558 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2773907A1] Distance between two adjoining face plate recesses belonging to the same pixel is greater than the gap between two adjacent X electrodes, allowing for the thickness of the gas-filled space between the two face plates to be greater than that required when the two recesses are substantially separated from the gap. A bisubstrate-type alternating plasma color display panel (PDP) comprises two face plates (2, 3) arranged opposite each other to form a space (13) intended to be filled with a gas. One of the face plates (3) has parallel X electrodes (X1-X5) separated by a gap (px), covered by at least one luminophore zone (B1-B3), and the other face plate (2) has at least one Y electrode (Y1a-Y2b). The luminophore zones are interlinked by at least one recess (Ep1-Ep8) where an X electrode and a Y electrode intersect, in order to localize discharges generated in the gas between the two electrodes. A color pixel (P) is formed by adjoining recesses located in the plane of the Y electrode in adjacent luminophore zones. For improved light output, the distance (L) between two adjoining recesses (Ep1, Ep2) belonging to the same pixel is greater than the gap (px) between two adjacent X electrodes, allowing for the thickness (H0) of the gas-filled space to be greater than that required when the two recesses are substantially separated from the gap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 17/49

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/20 (2012.01); H01J 11/12 (2012.01); H01J 11/42 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/42 (2013.01); H01J 11/12 (2013.01); H01J 2211/323 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2773907 A1 19990723; FR 2773907 B1 20000407; CN 1133193 C 20031231; CN 1256009 A 20000607; DE 69906885 D1 20030522; DE 69906885 T2 20040311; EP 0968512 A1 20000105; EP 0968512 B1 20030416; JP 2001516498 A 20010925; KR 100540620 B1 20060110; KR 20000075901 A 20001226; US 6124676 A 20000926; WO 9936934 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090114

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090114

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090114

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080103

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906885 P 20030522

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990818

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL