Global patent index - EP 0968518 A1

EP 0968518 A1 2000-01-05 - VACUUM DIODE WITH HIGH SATURATION CURRENT DENSITY AND QUICK RESPONSE TIME FOR DETECTING ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION

Title (en)

VACUUM DIODE WITH HIGH SATURATION CURRENT DENSITY AND QUICK RESPONSE TIME FOR DETECTING ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION

Title (de)

VAKUUMDIODE MIT HOHER SÄTTIGUNGSSTROMDICHTE UND KURZE ANTWORTZEIT ZUR ERFASSUNG ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER STRAHLUNG

Title (fr)

DIODE A VIDE A DENSITE DE COURANT DE SATURATION ELEVEE ET TEMPS DE REPONSE RAPIDE POUR LA DETECTION DE RAYONNEMENTS ELECTROMAGNETIQUES

Publication

EP 0968518 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98917194 A

Priority

  • FR 9800564 W
  • FR 9703476 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2761195A1] The invention concerns a vacuum diode with high saturation current density and quick response time for detecting electromagnetic radiation, comprising a cylindrical grid (6) and a photocathode (4) extending along the cylinder axis (X). The photocathode comprises part of the inner conductor of the coaxial cable (8), said coaxial cable outer conductor and electrically insulating material being eliminated opposite this part, and the grid is electrically connected to said coaxial cable outer conductor, the inner and outer conductors being coaxial. The invention is applicable to the detection of visible infrared, ultraviolet and X-radiation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 40/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 40/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 40/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843275A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2761195 A1 19980925; FR 2761195 B1 20061215; DE 69828494 D1 20050210; EP 0968518 A1 20000105; EP 0968518 B1 20050105; US 6337537 B1 20020108; WO 9843275 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-08-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050105

2005-04-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69828494

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20050210

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2005-01-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050105

2005-01-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050105

2005-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990916

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI