Global Patent Index - EP 0968520 A1

EP 0968520 A1 2000-01-05 - LOW-PRESSURE MERCURY DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (en)

LOW-PRESSURE MERCURY DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (de)

NIEDERDRUCKQUECKSILBERENTLADUNGSLAMPE

Title (fr)

LAMPE A DECHARGE AU MERCURE BASSE PRESSION

Publication

EP 0968520 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98945461 A

Priority

  • EP 98945461 A
  • EP 97203266 A
  • IB 9801567 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9921214A1] A low-pressure mercury discharge lamp of the invention comprises an envelope (1) that encloses a discharge space (2) in a gastight manner. The envelope is provided with a luminescent material (4) which is excitable with radiation of a wavelength of 254 nm. The envelope (1) is further provided with a further luminescent material (5) which has an excitation spectrum of which the value for a wavelength of 436 nm amounts to at least 10 % of that at a wavelenght of 254 nm, and which further luminescent material has an emission spectrum with a maximun in a wavelength range from 580 to 720 nm. The lamp of the invention has in a dimmed state of operation a color point of which the value of the x-coordinate is higher than in the nominal state of operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/08 (2006.01); C09K 11/56 (2006.01); C09K 11/64 (2006.01); C09K 11/66 (2006.01); C09K 11/73 (2006.01); C09K 11/78 (2006.01); C09K 11/80 (2006.01); H01J 61/44 (2006.01); H01J 61/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/48 (2013.01); H01J 61/327 (2013.01); H01J 61/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921214A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9921214 A1 19990429; CN 1129952 C 20031203; CN 1242871 A 20000126; DE 69820996 D1 20040212; DE 69820996 T2 20041209; EP 0968520 A1 20000105; EP 0968520 B1 20040107; JP 2001506403 A 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071008

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071008

2006-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-11-19 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820996 P 20040212

2004-02-04 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20040109

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991029

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB