Global patent index - EP 0968521 A1

EP 0968521 A1 2000-01-05 - FLAT SPOTLIGHT WITH DISCHARGE SEPARATED BY A DIELECTRIC LAYER AND DEVICE FOR THE ELECTRODES INTO THE LEADING DISCHARGE AREA

Title (en)

FLAT SPOTLIGHT WITH DISCHARGE SEPARATED BY A DIELECTRIC LAYER AND DEVICE FOR THE ELECTRODES INTO THE LEADING DISCHARGE AREA

Title (de)

FLACHSTRAHLER MIT DIELEKTRISCH BEHINDERTER ENTLADUNG UND ANORDNUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DER ELEKTRODEN IN DEN ENTLADUNGSRAUM

Title (fr)

SPOT PLAT A DECHARGE SEPAREE PAR UNE COUCHE DIELECTRIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DESTINE AU PASSAGE DES ELECTRODES DANS L'ESPACE DE DECHARGE

Publication

EP 0968521 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925419 A

Priority

  • DE 9800828 W
  • DE 19711891 A
  • DE 19729175 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9843280A1] The invention relates to a flat spotlight (1) with a closed, gas-filled discharge vessel (2) and enclosing band-shaped electrodes separated from the discharge by a dielectric layer. The discharge vessel (2) consists of at least one base plate (5) and one cover plate (6) which are assembled by soldering (8) so as to be gastight, and optionally, also by means of an additional frame (7) placed between the cover and base plate. In addition, the band-shaped internal electrodes (3, 4) verge into passages (10, 11), and these passages verge into external power leads (12, 13) in such a way that the internal electrodes (3, 4), the passages (10, 11) and the external power leads (12, 13) are respectively conceived as functionally different sections of structures (3, 10, 12; 4, 11, 13) of the printed conductor type on the cathodes and/or anodes. At least the anodes (4) are respectively coated with a dielectric layer (17). The passages (10, 11) are, in addition, optionally covered by the soldering (8) so as to be gastight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 65/00; H01J 5/02; H01J 5/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 65/00 (2006.01); H01J 61/30 (2006.01); H01J 61/36 (2006.01); H01J 65/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/307 (2013.01); H01J 65/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843280A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9843280 A1 19981001; CA 2281091 A1 19981001; CA 2281091 C 20061121; CN 1251205 A 20000419; CN 1278375 C 20061004; DE 19729175 A1 19990114; DE 59814343 D1 20090326; EP 0968521 A1 20000105; EP 0968521 B1 20090211; HU 0003101 A2 20010129; HU 0003101 A3 20030228; JP 2000510283 A 20000808; JP 3490461 B2 20040126; KR 100417438 B1 20040205; TW 393665 B 20000611

INPADOC legal status

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59814343

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090511

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090511

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUH

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090511

2009-08-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090522

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59814343

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20090326

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE