Global Patent Index - EP 0968538 A1

EP 0968538 A1 2000-01-05 - POLYMER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE COMPRISING AT LEAST A RECTIFYING FUNCTION AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

POLYMER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE COMPRISING AT LEAST A RECTIFYING FUNCTION AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

POLYMERE HALBLEITERANORDNUNG MIT EINER GLEICHRICHTENDEN FUNKTION UND DEREN HERSELLUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF SEMICONDUCTEUR EN POLYMERE COMPORTANT AU MOINS UNE FONCTION REDRESSEUSE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 0968538 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98906977 A

Priority

  • FR 9800212 W
  • FR 9701485 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2759495A1] The invention concerns a polymer semiconductor device comprising a rectifying function formed by a polymer film (12) between a first (11) and a second (13) electrode, the polymer film constituting a host matrix for polar molecules, the polar molecules being electrically oriented in a direction perpendicular to the electrodes, the electric charges of the polar molecules having the same sign being directed towards the same electrode. The invention also concerns a method for making such a device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 51/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 51/30 (2006.01); H01L 51/05 (2006.01); H01L 51/40 (2006.01); H01L 51/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 51/5012 (2013.01); H01L 51/4206 (2013.01); H01L 51/004 (2013.01); Y02E 10/549 (2013.01); Y02P 70/521 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9835393A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2759495 A1 19980814; FR 2759495 B1 19990305; EP 0968538 A1 20000105; US 2003010973 A1 20030116; US 6545290 B2 20030408; WO 9835393 A1 19980813

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140905

2014-05-21 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140424

2014-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 51/05 20060101ALI20140331BHEP

2014-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 51/50 20060101ALI20140331BHEP

2014-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 51/30 20060101AFI20140331BHEP

2010-05-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES

2008-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071213

2006-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990722

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT