Global patent index - EP 0968550 A1

EP 0968550 A1 2000-01-05 - LAMP SOCKET

Title (en)

LAMP SOCKET

Title (de)

LAMPENFASSUNG

Title (fr)

SOCLE D'AMPOULE

Publication

EP 0968550 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98910129 A

Priority

  • JP 8330397 A
  • US 9804093 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842049A1] The present invention provides a lamp socket which can easily be connected to a discharge lamp, and which has a high degree of safety. Lamp socket (10) includes first and second housings (20, 50) which are fastened together so that the housings clamp a plurality of wires (41a, 41b, 42, 43) of a shielded cable, and electrical terminals (31a, 31b, 32, 33) which are connected to the wires. The first and second housings (20, 50) have main body sections (27, 57) which support the terminals, and extension sections (28, 58) which protrude from the main body sections (27, 57) and along which and from which the wires extend. Shielding conductor (8) of the shielded cable is fastened to outside surfaces (23, 53) of the extension sections (28, 58).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/658 (2006.01); H01R 33/05 (2006.01); H01R 33/46 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/46 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842049A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842049 A1 19980924; AU 6444598 A 19981012; DE 69805402 D1 20020620; DE 69805402 T2 20030109; EP 0968550 A1 20000105; EP 0968550 B1 20020515; JP H10261472 A 19980929

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69805402

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-20

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991004

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB