Global patent index - EP 0968555 A1

EP 0968555 A1 2000-01-05 - RECOVERABLE ARTICLE

Title (en)

RECOVERABLE ARTICLE

Title (de)

RÜCKSTELLBARER GEGENSTAND

Title (fr)

ARTICLE EXTENSIBLE RETROUVANT SA FORME

Publication

EP 0968555 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98910435 A

Priority

  • US 9805137 W
  • US 82018897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842059A1] A recoverable article comprises an inner resilient radially elastomeric tubular member (2) that is held in its expanded configuration by an outer relatively rigid shell (6). The interface between the member (2) and the shell (6) comprises a plurality of circumferentially-spaced parallel strips (4) coated onto the member (2). The strips (4) prevent the shell (6) from bonding to the member (2) in those regions. The shell (6) is castellated with its valleys (12) adjacent the edges of the strips (4). The lands (8) of the castellated shell (6) overlying the strips (4) can be peeled back to permit the resilient member (2) to recover towards its original configuration, for example around a power cable splice.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02G 15/18; B29C 61/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 61/06 (2006.01); H02G 1/14 (2006.01); H02G 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02G 1/14 (2013.01); H02G 15/1826 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1393 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842059A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842059 A1 19980924; AU 6467898 A 19981012; CA 2284267 A1 19980924; DE 69811347 D1 20030320; DE 69811347 T2 20031127; DK 0968555 T3 20030310; EP 0968555 A1 20000105; EP 0968555 B1 20030212; JP 2001516556 A 20010925; US 5856634 A 19990105

INPADOC legal status

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090318

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090317

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090317

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090317

2009-11-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-11-09 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080317

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-03-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 09

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69811347

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030320

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

2003-02-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990916

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT NL SE