Global Patent Index - EP 0968566 A1

EP 0968566 A1 2000-01-05 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR PRODUCING HARD TURN-ON PULSES FOR A GATE TURN-OFF THYRISTOR

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE FOR PRODUCING HARD TURN-ON PULSES FOR A GATE TURN-OFF THYRISTOR

Title (de)

ANSTEUEREINRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG HARTER EINSCHALTIMPULSE FÜR EINEN ABSCHALTBAREN THYRISTOR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DESTINE A PRODUIRE DE IMPULSIONS POINTUES DE DEBLOCAGE POUR UN THYRISTOR BLOCABLE PAR LA GACHETTE

Publication

EP 0968566 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925401 A

Priority

  • DE 9800787 W
  • DE 19711966 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711966C1] The invention relates to a control device for producing hard turn-on pulses for a gate turn-off thyristor (2) having a parallel circuit (4) consisting of a capacitor (C1) with an anti-parallel diode (D1), a first inductive resistor (L1) and a switching element (8) in addition to a recharge circuit (6). The parallel circuit (4) is electrically series connected to the output connection (10, 12) of the control device and the recharge circuit (6) is electrically series connected to the capacitor (C1). According to the invention, a second inductive resistor (L2) is connected upstream to the anti-parallel diode (D1). The value of the second inductive resistor (L2) is substantially greater than the value of the first inductive resistor (L1). A decoupling diode (D2) is connected between the inductive resistor (L1) and the switching element (8), thereby providing a control device which produces hard turn-on impulses with substantially fewer losses and substantially lower power requirements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03K 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02M 1/08 (2006.01); H03K 17/73 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02M 1/08 (2013.01); H03K 17/73 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843350A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711966 C1 19980610; EP 0968566 A1 20000105; WO 9843350 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010419

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 03K 17/04 A, 7H 03K 17/73 B, 7H 02M 1/08 B

2001-04-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 03K 17/04 A, 7H 03K 17/73 B, 7H 02M 1/08 B

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI