Global Patent Index - EP 0968611 A1

EP 0968611 A1 2000-01-05 - DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM

Title (en)

DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM

Title (de)

DATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 0968611 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97921756 A

Priority

  • EP 97921756 A
  • EP 9702116 W
  • EP 97400650 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9843433A1] A receiver/decoder for a broadcast digital television system in which received signals are passed through a receiver to the receiver/decoder and then to a television set. The receiver/decoder decodes a compressed MPEG-type signal, and is controlled by a remote controller handset, through an interface in the receiver/decoder. The operation of the receiver/decoder is controlled by a virtual machine (VM) which includes a run time engine (RTE). The receiver/decoder includes a plurality of interfaces to external units, and logical driver devices for the interfaces. Applications control the external units by the RTE, which receives events from the interfaces via a set of queues. The RTE comprises a plurality of process sequencer units associated with the device means, and means for extracting events from the queue means and actuating the associated process sequencer units accordingly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/173; G06F 9/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/445 (2006.01); G06F 9/06 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06F 9/48 (2006.01); G06F 11/00 (2006.01); G06F 11/08 (2006.01); G06F 11/10 (2006.01); G06F 11/26 (2006.01); G06F 11/28 (2006.01); G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 12/02 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/10 (2006.01); G06F 21/24 (2006.01); G06K 17/00 (2006.01); G06K 19/00 (2006.01); G06K 19/07 (2006.01); G06T 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 7/00 (2006.01); G07F 7/10 (2006.01); G09C 1/00 (2006.01); G11C 8/06 (2006.01); G11C 16/02 (2006.01); H04B 1/713 (2006.01); H04H 20/02 (2008.01); H04H 40/00 (2008.01); H04L 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/10 (2006.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01); H04L 12/56 (2006.01); H04L 13/08 (2006.01); H04L 29/10 (2006.01); H04N 5/00 (2011.01); H04N 5/222 (2006.01); H04N 5/455 (2006.01); H04N 7/14 (2006.01); H04N 7/16 (2011.01); H04N 7/167 (2011.01); H04N 7/173 (2011.01); H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04N 7/66 (2006.01); H04N 17/00 (2006.01); H04N 17/04 (2006.01); H04N 21/258 (2011.01); H04N 21/4367 (2011.01); H04N 21/442 (2011.01); H04N 21/81 (2011.01); H04N 5/44 (2011.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H04N (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/4843 (2013.01); G06F 11/10 (2013.01); G06Q 20/341 (2013.01); G06Q 20/40975 (2013.01); G06T 9/007 (2013.01); G07F 7/1008 (2013.01); G07F 17/0014 (2013.01); G11C 16/105 (2013.01); H04N 7/163 (2013.01); H04N 7/1675 (2013.01); H04N 7/17309 (2013.01); H04N 7/17318 (2013.01); H04N 17/004 (2013.01); H04N 21/258 (2013.01); H04N 21/4367 (2013.01); H04N 21/44236 (2013.01); H04N 21/8166 (2013.01); H04N 5/4401 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9843433 A1 19981001; AU 2770997 A 19981020; AU 740740 B2 20011115; BR 9714598 A 20020806; CA 2284011 A1 19981001; CN 1254478 A 20000524; EP 0968611 A1 20000105; IL 131947 D0 20010319; JP 2001518262 A 20011009; NO 994540 A 19991122; NO 994540 D0 19990917; NZ 500206 A 20020828; PL 183663 B1 20020628; PL 335775 A1 20000522; TR 9902271 T2 19991221; ZA 9703613 B 19980323

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1024809

2005-04-20 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING S.A.

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANAL+ TECHNOLOGIES

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991020

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991020;LT PAYMENT 19991020;LV PAYMENT 19991020;RO PAYMENT 19991020;SI PAYMENT 19991020