Global Patent Index - EP 0968628 A1

EP 0968628 A1 2000-01-05 - USE OF AN ACTIVE DISCHARGE ELECTRODE FOR MINIMIZING POSITIVE AND/OR NEGATIVE CHARGES ON MOVING MATERIAL WEBS

Title (en)

USE OF AN ACTIVE DISCHARGE ELECTRODE FOR MINIMIZING POSITIVE AND/OR NEGATIVE CHARGES ON MOVING MATERIAL WEBS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG EINER AKTIVEN ENTLADEELEKTRODE ZUM MINIMIEREN VON POSITIVEN UND/ODER NEGATIVEN LADUNGEN AUF BEWEGTEN MATERIALBAHNEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'UNE ELECTRODE DE DECHARGE ACTIVE POUR MINIMISER LES CHARGES POSITIVES ET/OU NEGATIVES SUR DES BANDES DE MATERIAU EN MOUVEMENT

Publication

EP 0968628 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98910741 A

Priority

  • DE 19711342 A
  • EP 9801382 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711342A1] The invention concerns an active discharge electrode (5) for minimizing positive and/or negative charges on moving material webs. The active discharge electrode (5) comprises a plurality of needle-shaped individual electrodes (8) which are disposed mutually parallel and can be connected to a high-voltage source, preferably a high-voltage transformer. The active discharge electrode (5) further comprises at least one earthing conductor (11) extending at right angles to and along the plurality of individual electrodes (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05F 3/04; B41F 3/00; B41F 23/00; H01T 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/00 (2006.01); H01T 19/04 (2006.01); H05F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 19/04 (2013.01); H05F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842166A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711342 A1 19980924; DE 19711342 C2 19990121; AT 333777 T 20060815; DE 59813647 D1 20060831; EP 0968628 A1 20000105; EP 0968628 B1 20060719; JP 2000513870 A 20001017; US 6504700 B1 20030107; WO 9842166 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070310

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK G.- MBH

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LAZURKA, UDO

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK GESELLSCHAFT MBH

2007-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070116

2007-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061030

2006-10-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813647 P 20060831

2006-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-04-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF AN ACTIVE DISCHARGE ELECTRODE FOR MINIMIZING POSITIVE AND/OR NEGATIVE CHARGES ON MOVING MATERIAL WEBS

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990707

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE