Global Patent Index - EP 0968664 A1

EP 0968664 A1 2000-01-05 - Ski boot

Title (en)

Ski boot

Title (de)

Skischuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure de ski

Publication

EP 0968664 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99810508 A

Priority

CH 143398 A

Abstract (en)

The ski boot comprises a collar (4) articulated on a body (1) and a collar retainer opposing its tipping rearwards but giving way when the tipping force exceed a specified value. The retainer comprises a ramp (12) fixed to the body against which a support part (8) integral with the collar is supported. The support ramp can push against a spring (9). The retainer has an escape position allowing free rearward tipping of the collar.

Abstract (fr)

La chaussure comporte un collier (4) articulé sur une coque (1) et des moyens de retenue du collier s'opposant au basculement du collier vers l'arrière, mais cédant lorsque l'effort de basculement dépasse une valeur déterminée. Ces moyens sont constitués essentiellement d'une rampe (12) solidaire de la coque ou de l'autre partie de la chaussure et contre laquelle s'appuie un élément d'appui (8) solidaire du collier. La rampe et l'élément d'appui. peuvent se repousser mutuellement contre l'action d'un ressort (9) . Une position d'échappement autorise le basculement du collier. Une telle chaussure est destinée à prévenir le déchirement du ligament croisé antérieur du genou. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/046 (2013.01); A43B 5/0456 (2013.01); A43B 5/0474 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968664 A1 20000105; EP 0968664 B1 20030730; CH 692232 A5 20020415; DE 69909911 D1 20030904; DE 69909911 T2 20040527; US 6298584 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070610

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909911 P 20030904

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011107

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI