Global patent index - EP 0968666 A1

EP 0968666 A1 2000-01-05 - Ski boot

Title (en)

Ski boot

Title (de)

Skischuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure de ski

Publication

EP 0968666 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99810510 A

Priority

CH 143598 A

Abstract (en)

The ski boot comprises sole (3) and an ankle part (2) enveloping the foot and the heel. A second boot part is constituted by a collar (4) articulated to the ankle part so as to allow a front to rear movement of the collar. A collar retainer is constituted by a stop (11) and a deformable resilient strip (6).

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention a pour objet une chaussure de ski comprenant une première partie constituée essentiellement d'une semelle (3) et d'une tige (2) enveloppant le pied et la région malléolaire et une seconde partie constituée d'un collier articulé (4) par rapport à la tige de manière à permettre un mouvement du collier d'avant en arrière et inversement, et des moyens de retenue du collier s'opposant au basculement du collier vers l'arrière, mais cédant lorsque l'effort tendant à faire basculer le collier dépasse une valeur déterminée. Les moyens de retenue sont bistables. Ils sont constitués d'une butée (11) solidaire d'une partie de la chaussure et d'une pièce (6) élastiquement déformable, par exemple une lame bombée, solidaire de l'autre partie de la chaussure et destinée à être déformée par la butée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/046 (2013.01); A43B 5/0456 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968666 A1 20000105; EP 0968666 B1 20021002; CH 692233 A5 20020415; DE 69903222 D1 20021107; DE 69903222 T2 20030710; US 6295745 B1 20011002

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070610

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080229

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69903222

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-07

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020208

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI