Global Patent Index - EP 0968669 B1

EP 0968669 B1 2000-10-25 - Bracelet made of a flexible setting and of links ; process for making the same

Title (en)

Bracelet made of a flexible setting and of links ; process for making the same

Title (de)

Mehrgliedriges Armband mit einer biegsamen Fassung und Verfahren zur dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Bracelet formé par une structure souple et par une pluralité d'éléments durs et procédé d'assemblage d'un tel bracelet

Publication

EP 0968669 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98112334 A

Priority

EP 98112334 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0968669A1] The bracelet (2) is made of a flexible structure with several metal or ceramic components (6) defining a hard structure in the bracelet median region (8). The lateral regions (9,10) are made by stitching (36,38) upper and lower leather layers.

Abstract (fr)

Bracelet (2) formé par une structure souple (4) et par une pluralité d'éléments durs (6) définissant une structure dure, notamment métallique, agencée dans la région médiane (8) du bracelet. Les éléments durs et la structure souple comprennent des moyens de fixation complémentaires définis par des parties respectives (20,22) qui forment réciproquement des butées selon une direction perpendiculaire (24) à la surface générale (26) définie par la structure souple. Cette structure souple comprend des parties élastiquement déformables qui sont sollicitées pour l'assemblage des éléments durs avec celle-ci. Les caractéristiques du bracelet permettent un assemblage aisé et sans détérioration. De plus, un changement de la partie souple peut être effectué sans endommager les éléments durs, notamment en or. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/00; A44C 5/02; A44C 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/00 (2006.01); A44C 5/02 (2006.01); A44C 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/02 (2013.01); A44C 5/0053 (2013.01); A44C 27/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968669 A1 20000105; EP 0968669 B1 20001025; CN 1149945 C 20040519; CN 1249154 A 20000405; DE 69800365 D1 20001130; DE 69800365 T2 20010517; ES 2153697 T3 20010301; SG 72967 A1 20000523; TW 436273 B 20010528; US 6289664 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060704

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060704

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060703

2005-08-12 [REG FR ER] ERRATA LISTED IN THE FRENCH OFFICIAL JOURNAL (BOPI)

2005-07-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050627

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050624

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050624

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153697 T3

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-01-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800365 20001130

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-10-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990420

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI