Global Patent Index - EP 0968672 A2

EP 0968672 A2 2000-01-05 - Manufacturing process for dual head toothbrushes

Title (en)

Manufacturing process for dual head toothbrushes

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren für Doppelkopzahnfbürsten

Title (fr)

Procédé de production pour brosses à dents à double tête

Publication

EP 0968672 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99110715 A

Priority

DE 19824325 A

Abstract (en)

Bristled heads (8) are arranged in mirror-image formation on a three-dimensional base part (1) extending from a grip to a long handle (2) and then divide into two handles with right and left curved arm (4,5). The bristles (10) are arranged in tufts in the heads and are cut, rounded and smoothed. The base is forked with or without a sloping part (62,66).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Art Zahnhygienebürsten, die mit zwei borstentragenden Köpfen den kompletten Dentalraum mit Zahnfleisch und Zähnen pflegt und behandelt. Das Problem die Borsten, die mit den Borstenenden, mit einem Putzspalt dazwischen, die sich spiegelbildlich gegenüberstehen, wird mit einer neuen technischen Möglichkeit durch ein Andoggen der borstentragenden Köpfe gelöst. Maschinelle und Handmontage mit drei Teilen, die spiegelbildlich zueinander passen, oder ein rechtes und linkes Teil erforderlich machen. Ein Anschlag im federnden Bereich des Kopfes verhindert ein Zusammenfallen der Borsten ineinander. Ein Basisteil im Spritz- oder Gießverfahren hergestellt, ermöglicht eine automatische Komplettmontage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 5/0012 (2013.01); A46B 9/045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824325 A1 19991223; EP 0968672 A2 20000105; EP 0968672 A3 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030103

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 46D 3/00 A, 7A 46B 9/04 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI