Global Patent Index - EP 0968673 A1

EP 0968673 A1 2000-01-05 - Cupboard with support strips

Title (en)

Cupboard with support strips

Title (de)

Kastenmöbelstück mit Tragleisten

Title (fr)

Placard avec des barres de support

Publication

EP 0968673 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111715 A

Priority

DE 19829685 A

Abstract (en)

The holes (1c) in the support strip (1) for receiving horizontal pins in a base support component are formed by sleeves (1d) integrally formed from the strip and inserted into borings in the cupboard side wall.

Abstract (de)

Ein Kastenmöbelstück besitzt Tragleisten (1; 1'), welche in vertikaler Ausrichtung in die Innenseite einer Möbelseitenwand (3) eingesetzt sind und voneinander beabstandete Vertiefungen (1c) zur Aufnahme von horizontalen Zapfenbereichen (2a) eines Bodenträgers (2) aufweisen. Die Vertiefungen (1c) sind durch einstückig an die Tragleiste (1; 1') angeformte Hülsen (1d; 1d'; 1d'') gebildet, die in Aufnahmebohrungen (3a) der Möbelseitenwand (3) eingesetzt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 57/48; A47B 96/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/48 (2006.01); A47B 96/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/487 (2013.01); A47B 96/068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968673 A1 20000105; EP 0968673 B1 20030702; AT 243961 T 20030715; DE 19829685 A1 20000105; DE 19829685 C2 20010927; DK 0968673 T3 20030818; ES 2197549 T3 20040101

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2197549

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-08-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906161

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-07-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020326

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI