Global patent index - EP 0968678 A1

EP 0968678 A1 2000-01-05 - Household machine with a building part couplable to a basic body

Title (en)

Household machine with a building part couplable to a basic body

Title (de)

Haushaltsgerät mit einem an einem Grundkörper ankoppelbaren Bauteil

Title (fr)

Appareil ménager ayant une pièce de construction accouplable à un corp de base

Publication

EP 0968678 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99109136 A

Priority

DE 29811703 U

Abstract (en)

The fastening device (15,17) comprises an anchor-shaped suspension device (17) at its end facing away from the component and comprises a rubber band (15). The component (13) is a connecting sleeve with a tube connecting piece for joining tube-shaped components (7,9).

Abstract (de)

Haushaltsgerät mit einem an einem Grundkörper ankoppelbaren Bauteil, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das Bauteil (13) ein elastisches Befestigungsmittel (15,17) umfaßt, das an seinem vom Bauteil (13) abgewandten Ende am Grundkörper (21) ankoppelbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42; F16L 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4246 (2013.01); D06F 39/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29811703 U1 19991111; EP 0968678 A1 20000105; EP 0968678 B1 20040324

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150514

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090508

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090508

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080520

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59908929

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040429

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI