Global patent index - EP 0968699 A1

EP 0968699 A1 2000-01-05 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING CARBONATED SPRING

Title (en)

METHOD OF MANUFACTURING CARBONATED SPRING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN VON KARBONISIERTEM WASSER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'EAU GAZEIFIEE

Publication

EP 0968699 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98901501 A

Priority

  • JP 9800458 W
  • JP 2258697 A
  • JP 35114197 A

Abstract (en)

A method for the preparation of a carbonate spring by supplying carbon dioxide to a carbon dioxide dissolver and dissolving the carbon dioxide in raw water, which comprises the steps of measuring the pH of the formed carbonate spring, calculating the carbon dioxide concentration data of the formed carbonate spring from the measured pH value and the alkalinity of the raw water, and controlling the feed rate of the carbon dioxide supplied to the carbon dioxide dissolver so as to make the carbon dioxide concentration data equal to a preset target carbon dioxide concentration value. According to this method, a carbonate spring having a desired concentration can be easily prepared by using an inexpensive pH measuring device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 33/02 (2006.01); A61H 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 33/02 (2013.01); A61H 33/60 (2013.01); A61H 2033/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9834579 A1 19980813; AU 5779698 A 19980826; DE 69807851 D1 20021017; DE 69807851 T2 20030528; EP 0968699 A1 20000105; EP 0968699 A4 20000301; EP 0968699 B1 20020911

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160203

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150204

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-12-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101118 AND 20101124

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69807851

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021017

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011211

2000-03-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990826

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT