Global Patent Index - EP 0968737 A2

EP 0968737 A2 2000-01-05 - Pulley with automatic emergency brake

Title (en)

Pulley with automatic emergency brake

Title (de)

Riemenscheibe mit automatischer Notbremse

Title (fr)

Poulie avec frein de secours automatique

Publication

EP 0968737 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99112036 A

Priority

  • IT GE980022 U
  • IT GE990057 A

Abstract (en)

Pulley with automatic emergency brake consisting of a disk (1) guiding the rope (3) having a pull (7) and a load leg (8), rotary supported by a suitable yoke (5), this pulley being provided with a double walled rocker arm (9), the outer walls of which are mounted on the yoke (5) by means of transverse pivot pins (10) off-centered with respect to the shaft axis (4) of the above disk (1) in the direction of the pull leg (7) of the rope. The above rocker arm (9) has the shape of a right-angled triangle, its hypotenuse being slantwise located at the top, its smaller acute angle ( alpha ) located at the bottom towards the load leg (8) of the rope where an adjustable balance weight (12) is placed, whereas the greater acute angle ( beta ) is located at the upper end of the pull leg (7) of the rope where a transverse pin (13) is provided with a grip wedge (14) to release or block the rope (3) in the race (2) of the pulley disk (1) and finally the right angle ( gamma ) at the bottom towards the pull leg (7) of the rope featuring a snatch block (11) on which the pull rope (7) slides causing the release of the rope (3) when pulled, whereas the counterweight (12) will block the rope (3) when the pull leg (7) of the rope is not in traction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/14 (2006.01); A62B 1/06 (2006.01); B66D 5/16 (2006.01); B66D 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 5/16 (2013.01); A62B 1/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968737 A2 20000105; EP 0968737 A3 20010919; EP 0968737 B1 20080423; AT 392923 T 20080515; DE 69938572 D1 20080605; DE 69938572 T2 20090528; DK 0968737 T3 20080901; ES 2306491 T3 20081101; PT 968737 E 20080729

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170609

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170608

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170609

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170608

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170609

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170609

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170612

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170608

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20080401710

- Effective date: 20110104

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100623

2011-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110104

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100622

2011-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110101

2009-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090616

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090126

2009-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2306491 T3

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080423

2008-09-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20080423

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2008-09-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080401710

2008-09-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-07-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-07-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-06-25 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2008-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2008-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69938572 P 20080605

2008-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI NL PT SE

2008-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2008-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A62B 1/14 20060101AFI20070926BHEP

2007-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66D 1/06 20060101ALN20070926BHEP

2007-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A62B 1/14 20060101AFI20070917BHEP

2005-05-04 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-01-19 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20041029

2002-07-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI LI

2002-06-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010919;LT PAYMENT 20010919;LV PAYMENT 20010919;MK PAYMENT 20010919;RO PAYMENT 20010919;SI PAYMENT 20010919

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI