Global Patent Index - EP 0968738 A3

EP 0968738 A3 2000-08-02 - Test doll for decontamination tests

Title (en)

Test doll for decontamination tests

Title (de)

Versuchspuppe zur Dekontaminationsuntersuchung

Title (fr)

Poupée pour essais de décontamination

Publication

EP 0968738 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112064 A

Priority

  • DE 19829628 A
  • DE 19842792 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0968738A2] The dummy (1) is provided with at least one collection device (5) for decontamination liquid running off at least part of the dummy surface. An Independent claim is also included for the decontamination effect testing method, where the amount of decontamination liquid collected in the above device is measured.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 27/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968738 A2 20000105; EP 0968738 A3 20000802

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040103

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000819

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 62B 37/00 A

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI