Global patent index - EP 0968740 A2

EP 0968740 A2 2000-01-05 - Gravity distributor of balls, particularly for tennis practice

Title (en)

Gravity distributor of balls, particularly for tennis practice

Title (de)

Schwerkraftausnutzender Verteiler von Bällen, insbesondere für Tennis

Title (fr)

Distributeur par gravité de balles, en particulier pour le tennis

Publication

EP 0968740 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99109203 A

Priority

IT BO980408 A

Abstract (en)

A distributor of balls, includes a hopper (6) for containing a suitable number of balls (P), which are discharged one by one by means (7,9) controlled by the player or automatically by other means (12,13). There are means (11) for electric feeding of the discharging means and of control means, and there are means (15) for conveying the ball, cyclically discharged from the hopper, to the proper height and for making the same ball fall, due to gravity force, in front and beside the player, so that the he/she can volley the falling ball or hit the ball on the rebound, in order to exercise correct tennis strokes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 69/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 69/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968740 A2 20000105; EP 0968740 A3 20000412; AU 3794799 A 20000120; IT 1304452 B1 20010319; IT BO980408 A1 20000103

INPADOC legal status

2001-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7A 63B 47/00 A, 7A 63B 69/40 B, 7A 63B 69/38 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI