Global Patent Index - EP 0968742 A1

EP 0968742 A1 2000-01-05 - Release method for a in safety binding mounted ski boot and a mounting device for ski binding safety components

Title (en)

Release method for a in safety binding mounted ski boot and a mounting device for ski binding safety components

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Freigabe eines in eine Sicherheitsskibindung eingesetzten Skischuhes und Anordnung für einen Skibindungsteil einer Sicherheitsskibindung

Title (fr)

Procédé de libération d'une chaussure de ski d'une fixation de sécurité et dispositif de montage d'éléments de fixation de sécurité

Publication

EP 0968742 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98112100 A

Priority

EP 98112100 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves triggering a movement of at least one of the ski binding parts (1) relative to the ski (10) under certain predefinable conditions by which the ski boot is released at least substantially without force and independently of other triggering mechanisms. The relative movement of the ski binding with respect to the ski is a pivoting and/or displacement movement, the latter especially in the longitudinal direction of the ski. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for a ski binding part of a safety ski binding.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Freigabe eines in einer zwei Skibindungsteile - einen Vorderbacken (1) und einen Fersenhalter (1') - aufweisenden Sicherheitsskibindung eingesetzten Skischuhes eines Skifahrers. Dabei wird unter bestimmten, vorab festlegbaren Bedingungen eine Bewegung zumindest einer der Skibindungsteile relativ zum Ski (10) ausgelöst, durch welche der Skischuh, unabhängig von sonstigen Auslösemechanismen, zumindest im wesentlichen kraftfrei freigegeben wird. Die Erfindung betrifft ferner eine Anordnung für einen Skibindungsteil einer Sicherheitsskibindung, welcher zumindest einen gegen Federkraft wirkenden Auslösemechanismus für einen in die Bindung einzusetzenden Skischuh aufweist. Dabei ist der Skibindungsteil (1) um eine transversale Achse (7) verschwenkbar und/oder in Skilängsrichtung verschiebbar gelagert, durch einen von jedem Auslösemechanismus unabhängigen, steuerbaren Rastmechanismus gehalten und für eine zumindest im wesentlichen kraftfreie Verschwenk- und/oder Verschiebebewegung freigebbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/088; A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/08 (2012.01); A63C 9/088 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/0802 (2013.01); A63C 9/088 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968742 A1 20000105; EP 0968742 B1 20040114; AT 257734 T 20040115; DE 59810595 D1 20040219

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 257734 T

- Effective date: 20180701

2018-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-07-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59810595

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-09-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810595 P 20040219

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2004-01-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYROLIA TECHNOLOGY GMBH

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030220

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI