Global patent index - EP 0968760 A1

EP 0968760 A1 2000-01-05 - Mixer for preparating microbiological analysis and/or test samples

Title (en)

Mixer for preparating microbiological analysis and/or test samples

Title (de)

Mischer zur Herstellung von mikrobiologischen Analysen- und/oder Testproben

Title (fr)

Malaxeur pour la préparation d'échantillons, en vue d'effectuer des analyses et/ou des tests microbiologiques

Publication

EP 0968760 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401621 A

Priority

  • FR 9808587 A
  • FR 9809904 A

Abstract (en)

Samples are mixed by the pressure of jaws (12,13) on the outside of a bag (16) containing the sample. A mechanism which moves the jaws can be moved back or forth as necessary to adjust the intensity of mixing. Springs (22,23) act as shock absorbers on the jaws.

Abstract (fr)

Le malaxeur selon l'invention comprend deux structures mobiles l'une par rapport à l'autre, à savoir: une structure support fixe (1) comportant une porte sur laquelle viennent en appui les sacs (16) contenant les échantillons à analyser et une structure mobile (10) rigide ou déformable guidée par la structure fixe (1) de manière à pouvoir se déplacer par rapport à la porte (8), cette structure mobile (10) incluant le mécanisme d'actionnement des mâchoires qui servent à malaxer le sac. Des moyens de verrouillage de la partie mobile (10) sur la partie fixe (1) sont en outre prévus. L'invention sert à la préparation d'échantillons en vue d'effectuer des analyses et/ou des tests. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 11/00; A47J 43/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 11/0065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 2243494 A1
  • [A] WO 9743039 A1
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 262, 25 août 1987 (1987-08-25) & JP 62 065724 A (CHIYODA TECH & IND CO LTD), 25 mars 1987 (1987-03-25)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968760 A1 20000105; EP 0968760 B1 20021218; ES 2189360 T3 20030701

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160401

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150513

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150601

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2189360

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-05-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030429

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990705

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI