Global Patent Index - EP 0968770 A1

EP 0968770 A1 2000-01-05 - Method and apparatus for applying a coating such as paint or varnish

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for applying a coating such as paint or varnish

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Beschichten mit beispielsweise Farbe oder Lack

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour appliquer un revêtement tel qu'une peinture ou un vernis

Publication

EP 0968770 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401384 A

Priority

FR 9808544 A

Abstract (en)

The procedure involves placing the article to be painted on a turntable rotated by a shaft (7). Two nozzles (5,6) apply paint to the edges and surfaces of the article. Paint or varnish is applied to the center of the article which is then rotated. Centrifugal force spreads the paint from the center application point towards the edges. An Independent claim is included for apparatus to carry out the procedure.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé pour appliquer un revêtement tel qu'un vernis ou une peinture sur un article creux (2). Il comporte l'opération consistant à déposer une quantité prédéterminée de revêtement à l'état fluide au centre d'une surface (3) de l'article et à l'étaler en faisant tourner l'article (2) sur lui-même. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/02; B05D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 11/08 (2006.01); B05D 1/00 (2006.01); B05D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/02 (2013.01); B05C 11/08 (2013.01); B05D 1/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] US 5762708 A 19980609 - MOTODA KIMIO [JP], et al
  • [XA] US 5711809 A 19980127 - KIMURA YOSHIO [JP], et al
  • [XA] EP 0556784 A1 19930825 - NEC CORP [JP]
  • [A] WO 9811998 A1 19980326 - 2C OPTICS INC [US]
  • [A] EP 0139478 A1 19850502 - BURROUGHS CORP [US]
  • [A] US 3804663 A 19740416 - CLARK D
  • [XA] US 5725903 A 19980310 - ROSTOKER MICHAEL D [US]
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 387 (C - 536) 14 October 1988 (1988-10-14)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 394 (C - 465) 23 December 1987 (1987-12-23)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 096, no. 010 31 October 1996 (1996-10-31)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 097, no. 003 31 March 1997 (1997-03-31)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 096, no. 001 31 January 1996 (1996-01-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 095, no. 010 30 November 1995 (1995-11-30)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 345 (E - 1571) 29 June 1994 (1994-06-29)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 020 (E - 1489) 13 January 1994 (1994-01-13)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968770 A1 20000105; EP 0968770 B1 20031210; DE 69913438 D1 20040122; DE 69913438 T2 20041007; ES 2212491 T3 20040716; FR 2780665 A1 20000107; FR 2780665 B1 20000915; US 6709698 B1 20040323

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090609

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090610

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090610

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090609

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090609

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080611

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080612

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080717

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212491 T3

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040209

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69913438 P 20040122

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR APPLYING A COATING SUCH AS PAINT OR VARNISH

2002-07-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR APPLYING A COATING SUCH AS PAINT OR VARNISH, AND PAINTED OR VARNISHED HOLLOW ARTICLE

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI