Global Patent Index - EP 0968775 A2

EP 0968775 A2 2000-01-05 - Self-centering expanding shaft with a composite system

Title (en)

Self-centering expanding shaft with a composite system

Title (de)

Selbstzentrierender spreizbarer Wickeldorn

Title (fr)

Mandrin de bobinage expansible à auto-centrage

Publication

EP 0968775 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99112546 A

Priority

IT MI980457 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a self-centering expanding shaft with a composite system - of the type comprising a structural cylinder, equipped with a pneumatic expanding system to block a reel and housing at least one pneumomechanical module to center the reel, said pneumomechanical module comprising a pair of opposed slidable thrust elements (3), coupled with gripping elements (4) apt to be extracted from and withdrawn into said structural cylinder (1), and two pressure chambers (8a,8b) positioned at its ends, in which said two pressure chambers (8a,8b) are connected through a single pneumatic line (10) which crosses the two thrust elements (3), the extraction of said gripping elements (4) being obtained by supplying compressed air into said compression chambers (8a,8b), and in that, at least an elastic element (7) is provided to act on said thrust elements (3) so as to reset the conditions of rest. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/30 (2006.01); B65H 75/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/243 (2013.01); B21C 47/30 (2013.01); B65H 75/242 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968775 A2 20000105; EP 0968775 A3 20020123; IT 244102 Y1 20020307; IT MI980457 U1 20000103

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-11-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21C 47/30 A, 7B 65H 75/24 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI