Global patent index - EP 0968778 A1

EP 0968778 A1 2000-01-05 - Device and method for continuous casting of hollow profiles

Title (en)

Device and method for continuous casting of hollow profiles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Stranggiessen von Werkstücken mit innerem Hohlraum

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour la coulée continue de pièces profilées creuses

Publication

EP 0968778 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110102 A

Priority

DE 19823797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823797A1] The temperature control system of the mold (4) allows zones of the workpiece (5) with larger wall thickness to be cooled at a higher rate, and zones with smaller wall thickness to be cooled at a lower rate or to be heated so the solidification front of the workpiece lies in a plane (E) which is at least roughly perpendicular to the vertical workpiece axis (A). The claimed method consists of cooling different workpiece zones at different rates or, if necessary, heating certain zones to produce a roughly horizontal solidification front in the workpiece.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Stranggießen von in ihrem Innenbereich zumindest eine Aussparung aufweisenden Werkstücken (5) mit geringen, über den Querschnitt sich verändernden Wandstärken weist einen Schmelztiegel (2), eine Einfülleinrichtung (3) und ein Formwerkzeug (4) auf, welches mit einem Temperierungssystem (7) versehen ist. Das Temperierungssystem des Formwerkzeugs ist so ausgelegt, daß Bereiche (11) des herzustellenden Werkstücks (5) mit einer größeren Wandstärke (d1) stärker kühlbar sind, und daß Bereiche (12) des herzustellenden Werkstücks (5) mit einer geringerer Wandstärke (d2) weniger stark kühlbar und/oder beheizbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04; B22D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/055 (2013.01); B22D 11/009 (2013.01); B22D 11/0406 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823797 A1 19991209; EP 0968778 A1 20000105; EP 0968778 B1 20041201; US 6401800 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-06-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59911163

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20050105

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021021

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI