Global patent index - EP 0968780 A1

EP 0968780 A1 2000-01-05 - Method for drawing a continuous casted strand

Title (en)

Method for drawing a continuous casted strand

Title (de)

Strangabzugsverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé d'étirer d'un lingot dans une installation de coulée continue

Publication

EP 0968780 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112239 A

Priority

DE 19829605 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829605C1] A strand withdrawal method, for an arcuate continuous casting machine, comprises adjusting the outlet speed from a strand straightening unit (4) such that the arcuate bending and straightening moments have positive values. A metal, especially steel, strand withdrawal method, for an arcuate continuous casting machine, comprises determining the initial bending moment applied in an inlet arcuate shaping unit (3), in addition to the final bending moment applied in a final straightening unit (4), and adjusting the outlet speed from the straightening unit (4) such that the initial and final bending moments have positive values.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Strangabzugsverfahren für einen in einer Bogenstranggießanlage gegossenen Metallstrang (5), insbesondere ein Stahlband (5), wobei der Metallstrang (5) zunächst aus einer Gießkokille (1) senkrecht abgezogen wird, dem Metallstrang (5) sodann in einem mit einem Eingangsmoment (Fe) angetriebenen Bogeneingangstreiber (3) eine Bogenform aufgeprägt wird und der Metallstrang (5) schließlich nach Erreichen einer waagrechten Stranglaufrichtung (x) in einem mit einem Ausgangsmoment (Fa) angetriebenen Bogenausgangstreiber (4) geradegerichtet wird. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß dem Bogeneingangstreiber (3) eine Eingangs- (ve) und dem Bogenausgangstreiber (4) eine Ausgangsgeschwindigkeit (va) vorgegeben werden, daß das Eingangs- (Fe) und das Ausgangsmoment (Fa) erfaßt werden und daß die Ausgangsgeschwindigkeit (va) derart eingestellt wird, daß sowohl das Eingangs- (Fe) als auch das Ausgangsmoment (Fa) einen positiven Wert aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 1508885 A1
  • [A] DE 2241032 A1
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 095 (M-209), 21. April 1983 (1983-04-21) & JP 58 020360 A (NIPPON KOKAN KK), 5. Februar 1983 (1983-02-05)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 057 (M-1210), 13. Februar 1992 (1992-02-13) & JP 03 254343 A (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD), 13. November 1991 (1991-11-13)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829605 C1 19991014; AT 243587 T 20030715; EP 0968780 A1 20000105; EP 0968780 B1 20030625; ES 2202965 T3 20040401; US 6260604 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140626

2016-03-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160301

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140625

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140625

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140625

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906063

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140625

2015-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 243587

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140625

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906063

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110625

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110626

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120101

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-01-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120101

2011-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2202965

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59906063

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030731

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990714

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI