Global patent index - EP 0968783 A1

EP 0968783 A1 2000-01-05 - Tool holder with radial fine positioning

Title (en)

Tool holder with radial fine positioning

Title (de)

Kurzklemmhalter mit radialer Feinverstellung

Title (fr)

Porte-plaquette avec positionnement fin radial

Publication

EP 0968783 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250191 A

Priority

DE 19827778 A

Abstract (en)

The cutting action of the cutting plate (3) is adjusted by a setscrew (8) whose pressure on the smooth part of its circumference (15) pairs up with a complementary zone (18) on the holder (5) to form the clamping pair and the break (F) in the holder for the plate movement comes in F shape. The fixing screw locating the holder in the boring bar is screwed against a powerful plate spring into the boring bar etc, using again a setscrew for plate adjustment with pressure zones clamping pair on holder and screw. The holder (5) is screwed to the base (2) in pre-tension. The wedging face (18) is on the holder pressure zone and the pressure zone of the setscrew (8) should be cylindrical or spherical.

Abstract (de)

Rotations-Werkzeug für die spanabhebende Bearbeitung insbesondere einen Kurzklemmhalter mit Standardschneidplatte, der in seinem vorderen Teil wenigstens eine Aufnahme für eine Schneidplatte und im Bereich zwischen seinen Enden ein Loch zum Durchtritt einer Befestigungsschraube aufweist, mit der er auf einem Träger, insbesondere einer Bohrstange festlegbar ist, wobei der Halter an seinem die Schneidplatte tragenden Teil mittels einer Verstellvorrichtung relativ zu einer Abstützung elastisch auslenkbar ist, der Halter mit einer Durchbrechung versehen ist und eine Parallel-Biegefeder-Anordnung bildet, so daß die Schneidplatte während ihrer Verstellung im wesentlichen eine Parallelverschiebung in bezug auf die Schneidkante erfährt, wobei die Verstellvorrichtung als Stellschraube ausgebildet ist, die an einem gewindelosen Umfangsteil eine Druckzone aufweist, die gemeinsam mit einer komplementären Zone am Halter ein Keilflächenpaar bildet. In einer Ausführungsform wirkt die Befestigungsschraube orthogonal zur Werzeugachse und unter einem spitzen Winkel zur Auslenkung der Schneidplatte. Die Stellschraube kann mit einer Skalierung für die Zustellung versehen sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23B 29/034

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 29/034 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23B 29/03446 (2013.01); B23B 29/03457 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827778 A1 19991223; DE 19827778 B4 20050504; EP 0968783 A1 20000105; EP 0968783 B1 20020911

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59902624

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021017

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI