Global Patent Index - EP 0968830 A3

EP 0968830 A3 2000-09-06 - Ink supplying apparatus

Title (en)

Ink supplying apparatus

Title (de)

Tintenversorgungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation en encre

Publication

EP 0968830 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99305124 A

Priority

JP 18475198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0968830A2] An ink supplying apparatus is provided that houses two ink packages in an upper portion thereof, and supplies inks to print heads. Waste ink drawn by the purge operation is injected into a first waste liquid chamber via an injection opening, and then absorbed into an absorber. When the first waste liquid chamber becomes filled with waste ink, waste ink flows into the second waste liquid chamber via a vent hole, and then into the third waste liquid chamber. Therefore, even if the first waste liquid chamber becomes filled with waste ink, ink will not leak out. A small ink cartridge houses two ink packages. Since each ink cartridge has two separate ink packages storing individual inks, the amount of ink to be wasted at the time of ink cartridge replacement is reduced and, therefore, the operating cost is reduced. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/165 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17546 (2013.01); B41J 2/16523 (2013.01); B41J 2/175 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 11/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968830 A2 20000105; EP 0968830 A3 20000906; JP 2000015826 A 20000118

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 2/175 A, 7B 41J 2/165 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI