Global patent index - EP 0968839 A1

EP 0968839 A1 2000-01-05 - Block

Title (en)

Block

Title (de)

Block

Title (fr)

Bloc

Publication

EP 0968839 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810617 A

Priority

EP 98810617 A

Abstract (en)

At least some of the paper sheets (2) are provided with a fragrance (D) over at least part of their surface and/or rear side (4).

Abstract (de)

Ein Block besteht aus einer Vielzahl von aufeinanderliegenden Blättern (2). Die Blätter sind entlang einer Kante (3) lösbar miteinander verbunden. Die Blätter (2) sind wenigstens auf einem Teil ihrer Oberfläche (4) mit einem Duftstoff versehen. Insbesondere können die Blätter mit einem Haftkleber in einem Haftbereich (5) miteinander lösbar verbunden sein und der Duftstoff (D) ist wenigstens im Haftbereich (5) auf die Rückseiten oder Oberflächen(4) der Blätter (2) aufgetragen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 5/003 (2013.01); B42P 2221/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (examination)

EP 0188883 A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968839 A1 20000105

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-09-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000420

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI