Global patent index - EP 0968841 A1

EP 0968841 A1 2000-01-05 - Binder for filing documents

Title (en)

Binder for filing documents

Title (de)

Sammelmappe

Title (fr)

Classeur pour la reliure de documents

Publication

EP 0968841 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110787 A

Priority

DE 19826221 A

Abstract (en)

A cost effective ring binder for envelopes with edge slots has the rings (8) moulded in one piece with a stud mount (11,12,13) whose stud ends are pushed through holes in the spine of the folder and secured by grip collars (14) on the outside of the spine. The cross section of the rings is non circular eg. elliptical, to engage and release the grip slots of the envelopes by a simple twist action. The envelopes are also fitted and removed simple by pulling or pressing, using the elasticity of the edge slots.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer insbesondere zur Aufnahme von Hüllen (1) mit randoffenen Ausstanzungen (7) bestimmten Sammelmappe dienen zur Halterung der Hüllen (1) Halteringe (8), die als Spritzgußteile mit Füßen (11) ausgebildet sind, die Ansätze (12) mit einem durch jeweils einen Rastring arretierbaren Kopf (13) aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19826221 A1 19991209; DE 19826221 C2 20000525; EP 0968841 A1 20000105; EP 0968841 B1 20021120; ES 2188063 T3 20030616

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2007-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060604

2007-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070101

2006-07-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060725

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060604

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040605

2005-06-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050620

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-05-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050525

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040618

- Year of fee payment: 06

2004-06-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040605

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030623

- Year of fee payment: 05

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2188063

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59903445

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030102

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020123

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB NL

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000204

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI