Global Patent Index - EP 0968845 A2

EP 0968845 A2 2000-01-05 - Method for producing a mural

Title (en)

Method for producing a mural

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Wandbildes

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'une décoration murale

Publication

EP 0968845 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112589 A

Priority

DE 19829627 A

Abstract (en)

An existing painting (1) is reproduced by a computer-generated image file. A computer breaks down this file in to single image elements (10-34), fits element measurements, alignments and perspectives to the geometry and design of a wall to be decorated, and then assembles these elements into a new image. A printer transfers this new image onto a base material prior to mounting on a wall or ceiling.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Wandbildes, insbesondere zur Verkleidung von Gebäude-Innenwänden oder Decken, weist die folgenden Schritte auf: Reproduzieren von zumindest einem existierenden Bildmotiv, insbesondere Gemälde; Zerlegen des reproduzierten Bildmotivs in einzelne Bildelemente; Anpassen der Abmessungen der Ausrichtung und/oder der Perspektiven einzelner ausgewählter Bildelemente an die Geometrie und die Gestalt der zu verkleidenden Wand und Zusammensetzen der ausgewählten Bildelemente zu einem neuen Bild; Übertragen des neugestalteten Bildes auf ein Trägermaterial und Anbringen des Trägermaterials an der zu verkleidenden Wand. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44F 11/02; B44D 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44D 2/00 (2006.01); B44F 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44D 2/00 (2013.01); B44F 11/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968845 A2 20000105; EP 0968845 A3 20030212; DE 19829627 C1 20000203

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1026177

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-12-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI