Global patent index - EP 0968899 A1

EP 0968899 A1 2000-01-05 - Railway vehicle with lateral deplacement of the pivot of the bogie

Title (en)

Railway vehicle with lateral deplacement of the pivot of the bogie

Title (de)

Schienenfahrzeug mit seitlicher Verschiebung des Drehzapfens des Drehgestells

Title (fr)

Véhicule ferroviaire à déplacement transversal du pivot de bogie d'un wagon

Publication

EP 0968899 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420146 A

Priority

FR 9808206 A

Abstract (en)

The vehicle (2) is articulated on its bogie (4) with respect to the chassis. It has a bogie support (16) and two connecting rods (8,10) that are articulated to an adjacent vehicle (2') and two levers (12,14) which are also articulated to the bogie support. The levers are free to pivot with respect to the median axes without acting on the support bogie whilst the connecting rods are subjected to longitudinal movements acting in the same directions. When the connecting rods are subjected to longitudinal movements in the opposite direction, the levers are driven in rotation about their pivot axis which is arranged at their adjacent ends. This causes the bogie support to rotate about its axis (18).

Abstract (fr)

Ce véhicule (2) est pourvu de moyens d'articulation du bogie (4) par rapport au châssis, qui comprennent un organe de support (16) du bogie (4), deux bielles (8, 10) destinées à être articulées à un véhicule ferroviaire voisin (2') et deux leviers (12, 14) articulés aux bielles (8, 10), et adjacents l'un de l'autre, les leviers étant en outre articulés à l'organe de support (16), les leviers (12, 14) étant libres de pivoter par rapport à des axes médians (20, 22), sensiblement sans action sur l'organe de support (16), lorsque les bielles (8, 10) sont soumises à des actions longitudinales dirigées selon un même sens, et lorsque les bielles (8, 10) sont soumises à des actions longitudinales dirigées selon des sens opposés, lesdits leviers sont alors entraînés en rotation autour d'un axe de pivotement des leviers, voisin de leurs extrémités adjacentes, de manière à provoquer la rotation de l'organe de support (16) autour de son axe (18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/46 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968899 A1 20000105; EP 0968899 B1 20040428; AT 265346 T 20040515; DE 69916710 D1 20040603; DE 69916710 T2 20040923; DK 0968899 T3 20040809; ES 2216472 T3 20041016; FR 2780374 A1 19991231; FR 2780374 B1 20000908; PT 968899 E 20040930

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 265346

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Effective date: 20140919

2014-10-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Effective date: 20140926

2014-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A., CH

2014-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69916710

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM HOLDINGS, PARIS, FR

- Effective date: 20140210

2014-03-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69916710

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PROPINDUS PATENTANWAELTE NIEDMERS JAEGER KOEST, DE

- Effective date: 20140210

2014-03-05 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20140226

2014-02-28 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES

- Effective date: 20140217

2014-02-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140123 AND 20140129

2014-02-17 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-02-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69916710

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PROPINDUS PATENTANWAELTE NIEDMERS JAEGER KOEST, DE

2014-02-10 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Effective date: 20140130

2014-02-06 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

- Effective date: 20140130

2013-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

2013-12-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM HOLDINGS, FR

2013-11-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

- Effective date: 20131018

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2216472

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040726

2004-08-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69916710

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040603

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries concerned: RO

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM HOLDINGS

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

2000-09-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000320

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI