Global patent index - EP 0968920 A1

EP 0968920 A1 2000-01-05 - Method and plant for the preparation of packages containing precooked fresh food

Title (en)

Method and plant for the preparation of packages containing precooked fresh food

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEREITEN VON FRISCHEN,VORGEKOCHTEN NAHRUNGSMITTEL ENTHALTENDEN VERPACKUNGEN

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation pour la préparation d'emballages contenant des aliments frais précuits

Publication

EP 0968920 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98117242 A

Priority

IT MI981511 A

Abstract (en)

The description relates to a continuous and closed-cycle method and the associated plant for the preparation of precooked fresh food, comprising: preparation of a packaging containing the precooked, cut and weighed product; subsequent pasteurization, in a microwave oven, of the product already arranged inside the packaging; cooling in a stream of sterile air which has undergone ultrafiltration beforehand; subsequent sealing of the packaging. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/00; B65B 55/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/00 (2006.01); B65B 55/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/001 (2013.01); B65B 55/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968920 A1 20000105; IT MI981511 A1 20000103

INPADOC legal status

2007-04-27 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1024674

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010317

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000704;LV PAYMENT 20000704;RO PAYMENT 20000704;SI PAYMENT 20000704

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI