Global Patent Index - EP 0968921 A1

EP 0968921 A1 2000-01-05 - Method and device for feeding an supplemental sheet to a stack of printed articles

Title (en)

Method and device for feeding an supplemental sheet to a stack of printed articles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zuführen einer Beilage zu einem Stapel von Druckerzeugnissen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour alimenter une feuille supplémentaire à une pile d'articles imprimés

Publication

EP 0968921 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810622 A

Priority

EP 98810622 A

Abstract (en)

A conveying unit (5) moving the stack (2) from the table (1), is used to transfer e.g. label or other marker (10) placed in readiness above conveying path, to the top of the stack. An Independent claim is included for corresponding equipment.

Abstract (de)

Bei dem erfindungsgemässen Verfahren wird auf den von einem Tisch (1) zur Einschlagstation (7) transportierten Stapel (2) durch einen ein Förderorgan (6) begleitenden Mitnehmer (13) eine in einer oberhalb des Förderweges (8) angeordneten Abholstation (9) bereitliegende Beilage (10) aufgelegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/14; B65B 61/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968921 A1 20000105; EP 0968921 B1 20030917; DE 59809648 D1 20031023; DK 0968921 T3 20040202

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59809648

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-04-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110719

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110718

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809648 P 20031023

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR FEEDING AN SUPPLEMENTAL SHEET TO A STACK OF PRINTED ARTICLES

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020531

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI