Global Patent Index - EP 0968926 A1

EP 0968926 A1 2000-01-05 - Container with stacking tabs and reinforcements for the stacking tabs

Title (en)

Container with stacking tabs and reinforcements for the stacking tabs

Title (de)

Behälter mit Stapelnasen und Armierung für eine Stapelnase

Title (fr)

Récipient pourvu de pattes d'empilage ainsi que de renforcements pour les pattes d'empilage

Publication

EP 0968926 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104767 A

Priority

DE 29811663 U

Abstract (en)

Each stacking protrusion (S) has a stiffening reinforcement (A) connected to the container wall (1) adjacent to it and transfers force, and preferably is also connected to the protrusion itself. The reinforcing is attached by adhesive, or fixed by form-locking or traction. The reinforcing stiffens the bend region (K) between the protrusion and adjacent container wall. The reinforcing also protects the free end (4) of the protrusion.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Behälter (B) aus Pappe oder Wellpappe mit Quaderform, insbesondere einem stapelfähigen Faltkarton entsprechend dem Euro-Kistenstandard, mit Stapelnasen (S), die angeformt sind und nach oben über eine Behälterwand (1) überstehen, ist jede Stapelnase (S) mit einer versteifenden Armierung (A) versehen. Die Stapelnase (S) wird durch die Armierung (A) gestützt und relativ zur angrenzenden Behälterwand (1) versteift, so daß sie beim Stapeln mehrerer solcher Behälter (B) zuverlässig und in der vorbestimmten Weise in die Gegenaufnahme eines darüberliegenden Behälters einzugreifen vermag. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/00; B65D 5/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/00 (2006.01); B65D 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/445 (2013.01); B65D 5/0035 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29811663 U1 19981105; EP 0968926 A1 20000105

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020618

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

2000-09-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000321;LV PAYMENT 20000321;SI PAYMENT 20000321

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI