Global Patent Index - EP 0968936 A1

EP 0968936 A1 2000-01-05 - Container bag

Title (en)

Container bag

Title (de)

Flexibler Grossbehälter

Title (fr)

Conteneur flexible

Publication

EP 0968936 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99201886 A

Priority

GB 9814239 A

Abstract (en)

A method is disclosed of attaching a top cover to a flexible intermediate bulk container having a side wall structure (12) of flexible circular woven fabric, a base (16) closing a lower open end of the side wall structure and a plurality of lifting loops (14) at the upper end of the side wall structure, each loop having a bight and two spaced legs, each leg being affixed by stitching to the side structure, a multi-layer band (20) formed by folding the top of the side wall extending circumferentially around at least the upper part of the side wall structure, and each leg (14) being stitched to the multi-layer band (20), the layers of the multi-layer band being stitched together by stitching (24) that comprises at least two substantially parallel rows of chain stitching passing through all layers of the multi-layer band and extending circumferentially around the upper part of the side wall structure characterised by forming the multi-layer band with one layer (22) of greater length than the other layer or layers so that it stands proud of the band (20), stitching the layers of the band together and the lifting loops thereto, and then attaching the top cover (26) to the layer (22) standing proud. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/1612 (2013.01); B65D 88/1668 (2013.01); B65D 88/1681 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968936 A1 20000105; AU 7880198 A 20000120; GB 9814239 D0 19980902; ID 23031 A 20000106; ZA 9807053 B 19981022

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-19 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1024898

2002-07-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020103

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI