Global patent index - EP 0968947 A2

EP 0968947 A2 2000-01-05 - Device for stacking flat articles

Title (en)

Device for stacking flat articles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Stapeln von flächigen Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour empiler des articles plats

Publication

EP 0968947 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111010 A

Priority

CH 142998 A

Abstract (en)

The stacker has a stacker shaft (12), a unit (36) to insert a lower sheet (28), e.g. information or protective sheet etc., into the shaft, and an ejector part (30). The insertion unit has a driver element (42) on the ejector part. When the ejector is in ready position, the driver element picks-up a lower sheet, and draws it into the shaft during ejection of a stack (22) from the shaft. The driver element has a needle-like driver peg (40), pointing downwards, which presses into the lower sheet.

Abstract (de)

Beim Ausstossen eines Stapels (22) aus dem Stapelschacht (12) mittels des Ausstosselements (30) wird jeweils ein Deckblatt (28) in den Stapelschacht (12) hineingezogen. Auf dieses Deckblatt (28) kommt dann der nächstfolgende Stapel (22) zu liegen. Am Ausstosselement (30) ist ein Träger (38) mit einem in Richtung gegen unten zeigenden Mitnahmestift (40) angeordnet. Auf diesen wird jeweils mittels eines anhebbaren Auflageblechs (50) ein auf diesem liegendes Deckblatt (28) aufgespiesst. Durch Umstellen des Abstreifhebels (46) nach dem Ausstossen des Stapels (22) wird das in den Stapelschacht (12) hineingezogene Deckblatt (28) vom Mitnahmestift (40) abgestreift. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/30; B65H 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/3081 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42266 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4263 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4565130 A

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968947 A2 20000105; EP 0968947 A3 20000517; EP 0968947 B1 20021106; CA 2276330 A1 20000103; CA 2276330 C 20061024; DE 59903294 D1 20021212; DK 0968947 T3 20021125; US 6241233 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59903294

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140903

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120610

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120610

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120611

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120610

2013-01-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-01-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110610

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110620

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110613

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Free Format Text: FERAG AG#ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FERAG AG#PATENTABTEILUNG Z. H. MARKUS FELIX ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH)

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59903294

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021212

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB IT LI NL SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020503

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: CH DE DK GB IT LI NL SE

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000422

2000-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7B 65H 31/30 A

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI