Global Patent Index - EP 0968949 A1

EP 0968949 A1 2000-01-05 - Weft feeder for weaving looms with improved means for the advancement and separation of the weft reserve turns

Title (en)

Weft feeder for weaving looms with improved means for the advancement and separation of the weft reserve turns

Title (de)

Schussfadenliefervorrichtung für Webmaschinen mit verbesserte Mittel zum Vorschub und Trennen von Schussfadenreservewindungen

Title (fr)

Fournisseur de trame pour métiers à tisser avec des moyens améliorés pour l'avancement et la séparation des boucles des fils de réserve

Publication

EP 0968949 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99112756 A

Priority

IT TO980124 U

Abstract (en)

A weft feeder for weaving looms comprising a fixed drum on which a windmilling arm winds a plurality of turns of yarn which constitute a weft reserve and wherein there is provided a device for moving the turns from the base to the free end of the drum; the device comprising rods which are associated with a central hub which is rotationally coupled, with a rolling bearing (22) interposed, to an oblique bush which is keyed on the driving shaft (14) of the feeder. The oblique bush (30) is constituted by a first bush body (31), which is substantially semicylindrical and is detachably associable with the driving shaft (14) in order to delimit an eccentric portion on the shaft, and by a second bush body (32), which is cylindrical and hollow and is suitable to be fitted on the eccentric portion which is delimited by the first body and has an external surface (15a) which is inclined with respect to the axis of the driving shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22; D03D 47/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/361 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968949 A1 20000105; EP 0968949 B1 20021002; DE 69903223 D1 20021107; DE 69903223 T2 20030814; IT 245866 Y1 20020326; IT TO980124 U1 20000103; IT TO980124 V0 19980703

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903223 20021107

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011025

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI